CA AR43 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-15-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Measure version as revised on June 27 corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-15-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Measure version as revised on June 27 corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 69th anniversary of the Korean War.
Title
Relative to the 69th anniversary of the Korean War.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - HR 43 Choi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Assembly | Measure version as revised on June 27 corrected. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2458.). |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Introduced. |