CA AR50 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2846.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2846.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the retirement of E. Dotson Wilson as Chief Clerk of the Assembly.
Title
Relative to the retirement of E. Dotson Wilson as Chief Clerk of the Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 2846.). |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Introduced. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200HR50 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200HR50 |