CA AR57 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-16-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2844.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-16-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2844.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Women’s Equality Day.
Title
Relative to Women’s Equality Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 2844.). |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 22). |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Introduced. |