CA AR78 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-17-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4275.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-17-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4275.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Nowrūz.
Title
Relative to Nowrūz.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4275.). |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 5). |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | Introduced. |