CA SB1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2057 to, and to add and repeal Sections 2017 and 2076.7 of, the Fish and Game Code, to add and repeal Title 26 (commencing with Section 120000) of the Government Code, to add and repeal Section 116365.04 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 13265 and 13350 of, and to add and repeal Sections 13250 and 13377.1 of, the Water Code, relating to public welfare.
Title
California Environmental, Public Health, and Workers Defense Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1 Atkins (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1 Atkins (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 1 Atkins Senate Third Reading By FRIEDMAN (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1 Atkins et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1 Atkins (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 1 Atkins Senate Third Reading By FRIEDMAN (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1 Atkins et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-09-27 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-09-27 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2954.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 3574.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 3572.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 18. Page 3203.) |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | July 1 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | June 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M., NAT. RES., and JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1366.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1086.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 797.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 622.) (April 9). |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 383.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ., N.R. & W., and JUD. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2017 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2057 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2076.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 120000 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116365.04 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13250 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13265 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13377.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |