CA SB100 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the Budget Act of 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB100 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 671.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback