CA SB1001 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 197 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to juries.
Title
Jury service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 197 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1001 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1001 |