CA SB1030 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 54221, 54230, 65583.2, 65589.5, 65655, 65852.2, and 65941.1 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 17980.12 and 34120.5 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 5849.7, 5849.8, and 5849.9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to housing, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1030 HOUSING Third Reading Urgency By CHIU (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1030 HOUSING (Wiener) Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1030 HOUSING (Wiener) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1030 HOUSING (Wiener) Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1030 HOUSING (Wiener) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5413.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Chiu. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 29). |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | July 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3678.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3663.) (June 9). |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3595.) (May 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2020-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65583.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65589.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65655 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65852.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65941.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 17980.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34120.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5849.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5849.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5849.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |