CA SB1031 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14250, 14410, 14456, 14807, 14811, 14851, and 15050 of, and to repeal Section 14655 of, the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Credit unions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 14250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14456 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14655 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14811 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 15050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1031 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1031 |