CA SB1042 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 25420) of Chapter 5 of Part 2 of Division 2 of Title 3 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: counties: acquisition and conveyance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Assembly - SB 1042 Walters Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1042 Walters (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1042 Walters (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-07-09 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-06-28 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2010-06-24 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-06-24 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5814.) To Senate. | |
2010-06-21 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-17 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in Committee on June 16.) | |
2010-05-13 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-03-25 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-03-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3024.) To Assembly. | |
2010-03-18 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-03-17 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2960.) | |
2010-02-26 | Set for hearing March 17. | |
2010-02-25 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-02-16 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |
2010-02-12 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |