CA SB1042 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-23 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-23 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56853, 56854, 56856, 56857, and 56862 of the Education Code, to amend Section 7826 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 6253.4, 7578, 8880.5, 11019, 11435.15, 14670.1, 14670.15, 14670.2, 14672.6, 14672.85, 14672.95, 14685, 14977.5, 16304.6, 19583.5, 19583.51, 19849.22, 20046.5, 20047, 20391, 20407, 20407.5, 20408, 20410, 20687.2, 27491, and 70659 of the Government Code, to amend Section 127450 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 1370.01, 1370.4, 1551.05, and 9001 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 1461, 1510, 1511, 1821, 1822, 2420, 2541, 2611, 2621, 2682, 2683, 2921, 3088, 3121, 3140, 3602, 3604, 3605, and 3611 of the Probate Code, and to amend Sections 1078, 3003, 4308, 4314, 5304, 5328.15, 5329, 6254, 6603, 6603.5, 6604.1, 6607, 6609.1, 6609.2, 7501, 7501.5, 7509, 8104, 10506, 14105.19, 14105.191, 14110, 15650, and 15658 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State Department of State Hospitals.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1042 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2012-03-22 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-03-22 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 2985.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-03-12 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-08 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2916.) Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-07 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |