CA SB1062 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4497 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental centers: sheltered workshops: minimum wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | April 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4497 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1062 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1062 |