CA SB107 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 810, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 810, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 56.109 to the Civil Code, to amend Sections 2029.300 and 2029.350 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 3421, 3424, 3427, and 3428 of, and to add Section 3453.5 to, the Family Code, and to amend Section 1326 of, and to add Section 819 to, the Penal Code, relating to health care.
Title
Gender-affirming health care.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Lori Wilson [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] |
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Matt Haney [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Sen. John Laird [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB107 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 107 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Wilson (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 107 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Wilson Amendment Set #1 (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Assembly - SB 107 Wiener Senate Third Reading Amend By WILSON Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB107 Wiener et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 107 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Wilson (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 107 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Wilson Amendment Set #1 (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Assembly - SB 107 Wiener Senate Third Reading Amend By WILSON Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB107 Wiener et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 810, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5371.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 5347.) |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Set for hearing August 30. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5201.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 6000.) |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 18. Page 5780.) |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 3). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2723.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Wiener. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Wiener. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 422.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 2029.300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 2029.350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 56.109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 3421 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3424 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3427 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3428 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3453.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1326 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 819 | New Code | See Bill Text |