CA SB1071 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on V.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 17132.9 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: exclusion: uniformed services: retirement pay.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-12SenateReferral to Com. on V.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and V.A.
2020-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2020-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17132.9Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback