CA SB1095 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the heading of Chapter 35 (commencing with Section 22948.20) of Division 8 of, to amend and renumber Sections 22948.22, 22948.23, 22948.24, and 22948.25 of, and to amend, renumber, and add Section 22948.21 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
In-vehicle cameras.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22948.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22948.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1095 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1095 |