CA SB11 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10091 and 10094 of, and to add Section 10094.5 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
The California FAIR Plan Association: basic property insurance: exclusions.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] | Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB11 Rubio et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - SB 11 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - SB 11 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1865.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2211.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 886.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 728.) (April 8). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | March 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10094 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10094.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |