CA SB1117 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 739.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Master-meter customers: electrical or gas service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1117 Monning Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1117 Monning et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Special Consent SB1117 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1117 Monning et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Special Consent SB1117 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5277.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 5). |
2020-07-29 | Assembly | July 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3687.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3540.) (May 14). |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 739.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |