CA SB1120 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66452.6 of, and to add Sections 65852.21 and 66411.7 to, the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Subdivisions: tentative maps.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1120 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Robert Rivas (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1120 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1120 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 18. Page 5509.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3818.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3769.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3613.) (May 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65852.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66411.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66452.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |