CA SB1130 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 281, 912.2, and 914.7 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.
Title
Communications: California Advanced Services Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1130 Lena Gonzalez et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1130 Lena Gonzalez et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 20). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | July 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | July 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 3883.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3769.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2. Page 3594.) (May 26). |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 912.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 914.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |