CA SB1138 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65583 and 65588 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing element: emergency shelters: rezoning of sites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1138 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Burke (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1138 Wiener et al (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1138 Wiener et al (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 14. Page 5418.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 20). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | July 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 3799.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3769.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3595.) (May 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2020-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65588 | Amended Code | Citation Text |