CA SB1146 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5412.) Ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1010.6 and 2025.310 of, and to add and repeal Section 599 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil procedure, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure: electronic filing, trial delays, and remote depositions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1146 Umberg Third Reading Urgency By Reyes (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1146 Umberg Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1146 Umberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-31 Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5412.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-09-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-18 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-09-01SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-09-01SenateUrgency clause adopted.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-27AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-27AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
2020-07-27AssemblyJuly 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-07-09AssemblyJuly 22 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-15SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3713.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-11SenateOrdered to third reading.
2020-06-11SenateFrom consent calendar on motion of Senator Jackson.
2020-05-29SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-05-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3583.) (May 22).
2020-05-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-05-13SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1010.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Code of Civil Procedure2025.310Amended CodeCitation Text
Code of Civil Procedure599New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback