CA SB1149 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 17059 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: credit: principal residence.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Set for hearing August 11. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | August 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Set for hearing August 1. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4207.) (June 8). |
2016-06-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Set for hearing June 8. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 4 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17059 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17141.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17205 | New Code | See Bill Text |