CA SB1153 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 9118.5, 9215.5, and 9311 to the Elections Code, relating to initiatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local initiatives: review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 1153 Stern Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1153 Stern (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4837.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4514.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code9108.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9118.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9201.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9215.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9311New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback