CA SB1157 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 1954.06 of the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Tenancy: credit reporting: lower income households.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1157 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1157 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Reyes (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1157 Bradford (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1157 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Reyes (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1157 Bradford (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 4396.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 6. Page 5173.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (August 12). |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 3675.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3584.) (May 22). |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1954.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |