CA SB1163 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-19 - May 19 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3559.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-19 - May 19 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3559.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3017 of the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: vote by mail ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [05-19-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | Senate | May 19 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3559.) Reconsideration granted. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-04-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 3017 | Amended Code | Citation Text |