CA SB118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4021.5, 4187.2, and 4187.5 of the Business and Professions Code, to add Section 66024.5 to the Education Code, to amend Sections 15402, 15420, 15421, 15422, and 15819.403 of, and to repeal Section 15403 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 290.5, 851.93, 977.2, 1170, 1203.425, 11105, 16532, 18010, 30400, 30405, 30406, 30412, 30414, 30442, 30445, 30447, 30448, 30450, 30452, 30454, 30456, 30470, 30485, 30515, 30900, and 30955 of, to add Sections 3000.01, 5003.7, and 30685 to, and to repeal Article 5 (commencing with Section 2985) of Chapter 7 of Title 1 of Part 3 of, the Penal Code, and to amend Section 1731.7 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-03 - Assembly - SB 118 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB118 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB118 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB118 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB118 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-08-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4056.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 16. Page 5054.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5051.) |
2020-07-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-08-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 677.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |