CA SB1182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on PUB. S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on PUB. S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1708.88 to the Civil Code, and to add Section 314.5 to the Penal Code, relating to unsolicited images.
Title
Unsolicited images.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on PUB. S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1708.88 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 314.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1182 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1182 |