CA SB1189 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7028.16, 7055, and 7151 of, and to add Section 7057.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 667.16 and 670 of the Penal Code, relating to contractors.
Title
Contracting business: home improvement: residential property.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1189 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1189 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1189 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1189 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1189 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4397.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5202.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3818.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3770.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3550.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2020-05-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7028.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7057.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 667.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 670 | Amended Code | Citation Text |