CA SB1190 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 205, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 205, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1946.7 of the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Tenancy: termination.
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1190 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1190 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Weber (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1190 Durazo et al (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1190 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Weber (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1190 Durazo et al (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 205, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 15. Page 5390.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (August 12). |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 3845.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3770.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3584.) (May 22). |
2020-05-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2020-04-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1946.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |