CA SB1198 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 290.04 and 9001 of the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders.
Title
Sex offenders: risk assessment research.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1198 Wilk et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1198 Wilk et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4422.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4306.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | April 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4627.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 9001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |