CA SB1198 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Coms. on E., U. & C., and JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Coms. on E., U. & C., and JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4216.6 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 950, 955.5, 958.5, and 975 of, to add Sections 951, 961.5, 962, 976, and 976.2 to, to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 328) to, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 328.3) to, Chapter 2.2 of Part 1 of Division 1 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to natural gas.
Title
Wade Kilpatrick Gas Safety and Workforce Adequacy Act of 2020.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Coms. on E., U. & C., and JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., E., U. & C., and JUD. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 4216.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 950 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 951 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 955.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 958.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 961.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 962 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 975 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 976 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 976.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1198 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1198 |