CA SB12 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 303, 388, 388.1, 450, 607.2, 11400, 11401, 11403, and 11405 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster youth.
Title
Foster youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Employment and Retirement Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB12 Beall (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Employment and Retirement Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB12 Beall (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1145.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 14). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 416.) (March 24). |
2015-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 388 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 388.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 607.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |