CA SB1212 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6539.6 of the Government Code, relating to joint powers.
Title
Joint powers authorities: San Gabriel Valley Regional Housing Trust: board of directors.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1212 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1212 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1212 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5280.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3681.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3576.) (May 21). |
2020-05-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 21. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | May 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6539.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |