CA SB123 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19620.15 of the Business and Professions Code, to add Part 4 (commencing with Section 19700) to Division 9 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Section 8878.109 of the Government Code, to amend Section 25215.5 of the Health and Safety Code, to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 4810) to Part 2.5 of Division 4 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 1525, 1552, 12879.7, and 13160 of the Water Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources: omnibus trailer bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB123 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 678.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19620.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 19700 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8878.109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4810 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 12879.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1552 | Amended Code | Citation Text |