CA SB1244 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 309, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 309, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26104 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis testing laboratories.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1244 Bradford Concurrence Special Consent (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1244 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Bonta (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1244 Bradford (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1244 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Bonta (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1244 Bradford (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 309, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to unfinished business. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Grove. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5293.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3677.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | June 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3550.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |