CA SB1254 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - May 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - May 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 7.5 (commencing with Section 3250) to Division 4 of the Probate Code, and to add Section 5014 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to guardians ad litem.
Title
Guardians ad litem: mental illnesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Senate | May 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 3250 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5014 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1254 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1254 |