CA SB1255 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 863, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 863, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 647 of the Penal Code, relating to disorderly conduct.
Title
Disorderly conduct: unlawful distribution of image.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1255 Cannella Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1255 Cannella Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1255 Cannella (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1255 Cannella Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1255 Cannella (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 863, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4806.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6299.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6127.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3592.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 8.) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 29). |
2014-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1524 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 312.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 502.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 786 | Amended Code | Citation Text |