CA SB1264 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19240, 19241, 19241.5, 19242, 19242.05, 19242.2, and 19242.3 of the Government Code, to add Sections 1565, 1565.5, and 1568.044 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 4512, 4701.6, 4705, 4747, and 4803 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to human services.
Title
Human services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1264 HUM. S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1264 HUMAN S. (Hurtado) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1264 HUMAN S (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1264 HUMAN S. (Hurtado) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1264 HUMAN S (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5283.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3843.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3771.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (May 19). |
2020-05-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19241.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19242 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19242.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19242.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19242.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1565 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1565.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1568.044 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4701.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4705 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4747 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |