CA SB1312 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on U. & E.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on U. & E.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 320 of, and to add Article 14 (commencing with Section 925) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 1 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Electrical corporations: undergrounding of infrastructure: deenergization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1312 McGuire et al (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 3840.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3771.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3594.) (May 26). |
2020-05-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 925 | New Code | See Bill Text |