CA SB1347 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-18 - August 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-18 - August 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4827 and 4905 of, and to add Section 4853.2 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Veterinary medicine: license exceptions: limited veterinary services premises registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1347 Galgiani et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1347 Galgiani et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) Reconsideration granted. |
2020-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3796.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3550.) (May 18). |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2020-05-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4853.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |