CA SB1348 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-26 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-26 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51177, 51178, 51178.5, 51182, and 51189 of the Government Code, to amend Section 13108.5 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 4124.5 and 4291 of, to add Section 4799.05.5 to, and to add and repeal Sections 4123.8, 4291.5, and 4291.6 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
Fire prevention: vegetation management: public education: grants: defensible space: fire hazard severity zones: forest management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1348 Stern (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1348 Stern (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 3882.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3771.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3561.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on EQ. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51178 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51178.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51182 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51189 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13108.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4123.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4124.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4799.05.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |