CA SB1349 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 29140 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 7291 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Transactions and use taxes: County of Contra Costa.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1349 Glazer Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1349 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Grayson (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1349 Glazer (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - [05-28-2020] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1349 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Grayson (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1349 Glazer (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - [05-28-2020] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 5290.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (August 11). |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 3677.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3639.) (June 3). |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Set for hearing June 3. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3613.) |
2020-05-21 | Senate | May 21 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3576.) |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 21. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on N.R. & W. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and N.R. & W. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 29140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |