CA SB135 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12945.2 of, and to repeal Section 12945.6 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 245.5 of the Labor Code, and to amend Sections 3301, 3302, 3303, and 3303.1 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to paid family leave, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Paid family leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Jackson. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1090.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 800.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12945.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12945.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3303.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 245.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |