CA SB1367 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25740 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 399.11 and 399.15 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to renewable energy.
Title
Renewable energy: 20% procurement attainment date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-23 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2010-02-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1367&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1367_bill_20100219_introduced.html |