CA SB1367 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3458.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3458.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6363.9 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exemption: public safety first responder vehicle: equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3458.) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3402.) Reconsideration granted. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6363.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |