CA SB1367 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 738, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 738, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 32642, 32643, and 32656.1 of, and to add Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 32659) to Division 22.9 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the San Diego River Conservancy.
Title
San Diego River Conservancy: San Diego Rivers Watershed Consortium Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1367 Atkins et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1367 Atkins Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1367 Atkins et al (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1367 Atkins Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1367 Atkins et al (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 738, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 5959.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6717.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Senate | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4309.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | May 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4788.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 32642 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32643 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32656.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32659 | New Code | See Bill Text |