CA SB1368 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 526, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 526, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 129040 and 129050 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 12695.18 and 12705 of the Insurance Code, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Health care.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Aanestad [R] | Sen. Elaine Alquist [D] | Asm. Gilbert Cedillo [D] | Sen. Dave Cox [R] |
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Gloria McLeod [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Sen. Gloria Romero [D] |
Sen. Tony Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1368 Committee on Health (Alquist) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 1368 HEALTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1368 Committee on Health (Alquist) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 1368 HEALTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1368 Committee on Health (Alquist) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 526, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-27 | To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57. | |
2010-08-19 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4652.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-12 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6180.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.) | |
2010-08-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-03 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-05-17 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3541.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-12 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-11 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-30 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3304.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-06 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-02-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |