CA SB1368 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 73.01 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways.
Title
State highways: relinquishment.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1368 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1368 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1368 Wolk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1368 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1368 Wolk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4549.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6048.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3610.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3715.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3314.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 73.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |