CA SB1368 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 218.7 and 226.2 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractors: wages: liability.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-24SenateRead first time.
2020-02-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code218.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code226.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback