CA SB1378 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3 and 5 of the San Gorgonio Pass Water Agency Law (Chapter 1435 of the Statutes of 1961), relating to the San Gorgonio Pass Water Agency.
Title
San Gorgonio Pass Water Agency: board of directors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |